Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Lauri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1661³BornAnagni
14 Apr 169129.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 171755.6AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
18 Jul 171755.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
31 Jul 172664.7AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
3 Mar 172866.3ResignedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
1747¹85.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Lauri:
Bishop Gregorio Lauri (born , died 1747) Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 101, and Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015