Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo Ibáñez

Deceased

Bishop of Tuy, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Sep 1319AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
4 May 1320Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
3 Sep 1326AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
1 Mar 1335DiedBishop of Tuy, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Ibáñez
Bishop Rodrigo Ibáñez (died ) Bishop of Tuy

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTordesillas, Diocese of Palencia

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 301, Number 140
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 314, and Page 501
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,480

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast