Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Milling, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jun 1474AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
21 Aug 1474Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
11 Mar 1492³DiedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Milling
Bishop Thomas Milling O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Hereford

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 466
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 163
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast