Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Helding

Deceased

Bishop of Merseburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1506¹Born
153327.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
6 Feb 153832.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
6 Feb 153832.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
21 Apr 153832.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
28 May 154943.4SelectedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
17 Mar 155044.2ConfirmedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
30 Sep 156155.7DiedBishop of Merseburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Helding (VIAF: 27866071)
Bishop Michael Helding (born 1506, died ) Bishop of Merseburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLangenenslingen
Ordained BishopAschaffenburg
Death PlaceWien

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 299, and Page 242
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018