Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastian von Heusenstamm

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1508Born
6 Oct 153123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
20 Oct 154537.5SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
27 Jan 154637.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
2 May 154638.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
18 Mar 155547.0DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sebastian von Heusenstamm (VIAF: 10637375)
Archbishop Sebastian von Heusenstamm (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrankfurt

  • a priest for 23.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1546, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018