Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berthold von Landsberg

Deceased

Bishop of Verden, Germany

Bishop of Hildesheim


Events

DateEventTitle
1470SelectedBishop of Verden, Germany
19 May 1470ConfirmedBishop of Verden, Germany
25 Sep 1480AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
4 May 1502DiedBishop of Verden, Germany

MicroData Summary for Berthold von Landsberg (VIAF: 33220614)
Bishop Berthold von Landsberg (died ) Bishop of Verden

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 265, and Page 165
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1470, Number 28*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Nov 2018

Quantcast