Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Haug

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

Titular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹BornSoultz
164038.0Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
9 Apr 164644.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
9 Apr 164644.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
30 Sep 164644.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
10 Jan 169189.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Haug:
Bishop Gabriel Haug (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 345
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015