Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pál Štefan Forgách

Deceased

Bishop of Vác, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1696³Born
3 Jun 171922.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 May 172023.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 174750.9SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
2 Oct 174751.3ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
14 Jan 174851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
26 Apr 175760.8SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
26 Sep 175761.3ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
Sep 1759³63.2DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pál Štefan Forgách
Bishop Pál Štefan Forgách (born , died Sep 1759) Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCseite

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 429, and Page 432
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast