Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Filastre

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateEventTitle
17 May 1437AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
28 Jan 1449AppointedBishop of Toul, France
1 Sep 1460SelectedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
4 Sep 1460ConfirmedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
11 Aug 1473DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Filastre:
Bishop Guillaume Filastre (died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 253, and Page 269
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013