Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Hachim

Deceased

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1817²Born
6 May 184932.3Ordained PriestPriest
1885²68.0AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
15 Jul 188568.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
25 Feb 188871.1DiedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Hachim
Archbishop Paul Hachim (born 1817, died ) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep, Archeparchy of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite)
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017