Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Guevara Noroņa, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoņedo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jan 1528AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
11 Apr 1537AppointedBishop of Mondoņedo, Spain
3 Apr 1545DiedBishop of Mondoņedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Guevara Noroņa
Bishop Antonio Guevara Noroņa O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Bishop of Mondoņedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreceņo, Diocese of Burgos
Death PlaceValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 40, Number 196
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245, and Page 206
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1528, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 Jun 2018

Quantcast