Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Reina

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480¹BornVenecia
13 Nov 153454.8AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
25 Apr 153555.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
5 Jun 153858.4AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
18 Jan 153959.0DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Reina:
Bishop Juan Reina (died ) Bishop of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 46, Number 236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 104, and Page 268
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1535, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015