Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco García Guerra, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560²BornFromista, Spain
29 Oct 160747.8SelectedArchbishop of México, Federal District
3 Dec 160747.9ConfirmedArchbishop of México, Federal District
5 Apr 160848.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
22 Feb 161252.1DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco García Guerra:
Archbishop Francisco García Guerra O.P. (died ) Archbishop of México

  • a bishop for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,833
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 240
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 124, Number 794
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015