Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Carpenter

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Worcester, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1399Born
20 Dec 144344.6AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
22 Mar 144444.9Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
Jul 147677.2ResignedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
Dec 147677.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Carpenter:
Bishop John Carpenter (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Worcester

  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 61
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 268
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013