Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Ricard de Gourdon de Genouillac de Vaillac

Deceased

Bishop of Tulle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574¹BornBordeaux
8 Nov 159925.8AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
1 May 160026.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
13 Jan 165379.0DiedBishop of Tulle, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Ricard de Gourdon de Genouillac de Vaillac:
Bishop Jean Ricard de Gourdon de Genouillac de Vaillac (born 1574, died ) Bishop of Tulle

  • a bishop for 52.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015