Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Alonso Moscoso

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1532BornAlgete
6 Jul 158250.1AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
30 Aug 159361.2AppointedBishop of León, Spain
9 May 160370.9AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
21 Aug 161482.2DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Alonso Moscoso:
Bishop Juan Alonso Moscoso (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 94, Number 589
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 206, and Page 222
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013