Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Carrillo de Acuña

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jul 1435AppointedAdministrator of Sigüenza, Spain
10 Aug 1446AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
1 Jul 1482DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Carrillo de Acuña
Archbishop Alfonso Carrillo de Acuña (died ) Archbishop of Toledo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 252, and Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast