Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyriaque-Georges Goga

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1820Born
1855¹34.9Ordained PriestPriest
1875¹54.9AppointedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
25 Jul 187555.5Ordained BishopBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
10 Feb 188262.0AppointedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
1892²71.9ResignedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
18 Jan 191191.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cyriaque-Georges Goga
Bishop Cyriaque-Georges Goga (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amadiyah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTelkef
Ordained BishopN.D. des Semences, Alquosh

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,345
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast