Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Matteo Cardinal Orsini, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
Dec 1294²ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Oct 1326AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
Nov 1326²Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
15 Jun 1327AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
18 Dec 1327AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
18 Dec 1327Elevated to Cardinal
1334²AppointedAdministrator of Palermo, Italy
1336²ResignedAdministrator of Palermo, Italy
18 Dec 1338AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
18 Aug 1340DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Orsini:
Cardinal Matteo Orsini O.P. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
  • a cardinal for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,088
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 78, and Page 453
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013