Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Giusti

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1685BornBitritto
20 May 174357.4AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
2 Jun 174357.5Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
176478.0DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Giusti:
Bishop Giuseppe Giusti (born ) Bishop of Venosa

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013