Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Giovio (il Vecchio)

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1483Born
13 Jan 152844.7AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
17 Apr 153349.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
11 Dec 155269.6DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Giovio (il Vecchio) (VIAF: 64015055)
Bishop Paolo Giovio (il Vecchio) (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComo, Diocese of Como
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1533, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast