Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcantonio Cardinal Colonna (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1523²Born
9 Jul 156037.5AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
12 Mar 156542.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156542.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
13 Oct 156845.7AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
25 Jun 157451.4ResignedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
5 Dec 158057.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
13 Oct 158663.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
8 Feb 158764.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
11 May 158764.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
14 Feb 159168.1AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
13 Mar 159774.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Colonna (Sr.) (VIAF: 72291143)
Marcantonio Cardinal Colonna (Sr.) (born 1523, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceZagarolo
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria, Church, Zagarolo

  • a cardinal for 32.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 289, and Page 308
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 45*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast