Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felipe Antonio Gil Taboada

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1655³BornBergazos
22 Apr 171559.9SelectedBishop of Osma, Spain
8 Jul 171560.1ConfirmedBishop of Osma, Spain
15 Sep 171560.3Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
4 Mar 172064.8AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
29 Apr 172266.9DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Antonio Gil Taboada:
Archbishop Felipe Antonio Gil Taboada (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,641
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 33, Number 99
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 222, and Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015