Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Walter Giffard

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England


Events

DateEventTitle
22 May 1264SelectedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
4 Jan 1265Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
15 Oct 1266AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
22 Apr 1279DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter Giffard:
Archbishop Walter Giffard (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 62
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 103
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013