Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert of Holy Island, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Oct 1274AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
9 Dec 1274Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
7 Jun 1283DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert of Holy Island
Bishop Robert of Holy Island O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Durham

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 230
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 64
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 287
  • osb: CB, 20 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016