Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Jacobini

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1703Born
21 Feb 172824.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 176157.7AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
30 Aug 176157.7Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
24 Mar 178682.3DiedBishop of Veroli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Jacobini
Bishop Giovanni Battista Jacobini (born , died ) Bishop of Veroli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenzano

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 439
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast