Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Robert Cardinal de Genève

Deceased

Bishop

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

Note/Previous Titular See: (Antipope Clement VII)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1342²BornAnnecy
3 Nov 136119.8AppointedBishop of Thérouanne, France
11 Oct 136826.8AppointedBishop of Cambrai, France
30 May 137129.4Elevated to Cardinal
30 May 137129.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
20 Sep 137836.7ResignedBishop of Cambrai, France
16 Sep 139452.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cambrai, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert de Genève:
Robert Cardinal de Genève (died ) Bishop of (unknown)

  • a cardinal for 23.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 May 1371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 24 Jan 2014