Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Gaudenti

Deceased

Bishop of Ossero (Osor)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1629BornSpalaten
19 Sep 165424.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 167343.2AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
12 Mar 167343.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
Sep 1719³89.8DiedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon Gaudenti:
Bishop Simon Gaudenti (born ) Bishop of Ossero (Osor)

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 46.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 107
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015