Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José García Fernández, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1663BornEmedo
9 Dec 172663.7AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
19 Jan 172763.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
9 Oct 174986.5DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for José García Fernández:
Bishop José García Fernández O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 44, Number 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013