Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Gallizia, B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar

Titular Bishop of Clysma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1701¹Born
17 Oct 172221.7ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
25 Jan 174140.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar
25 Jan 174140.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Clysma
29 Jan 174140.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clysma
23 Mar 174544.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pio Gallizia
Bishop Pio Gallizia B. (born 1701, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarello

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 171, and Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1741, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast