Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Galliani

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1668³BornMontis Auri
25 Dec 169628.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Dec 169628.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 172153.8AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
14 Dec 172153.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
Apr 1727³59.1DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Galliani:
Bishop Giuseppe Galliani (born , died Apr 1727) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 86
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015