Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Galindo Chávez y Pineda, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹BornVeracruz
30 May 169563.4AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
30 Nov 169563.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
7 Mar 170270.1DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Galindo Chávez y Pineda:
Bishop Felipe Galindo Chávez y Pineda O.P. (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,563
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,453
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015