Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Galeotti (Galeota)

Deceased

Administrator of Capaccio, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jun 1478AppointedBishop of Rapolla, Italy
30 Jan 1482AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
22 Mar 1514AppointedAdministrator of Capaccio, Italy
1 Dec 1520ResignedBishop of Squillace, Italy
1522²DiedAdministrator of Capaccio, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Galeotti (Galeota)
Bishop Vincenzo Galeotti (Galeota) (died 1522) Administrator of Capaccio

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 220, and Page 241
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 151, and Page 303
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1478, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 27 Nov 2018

Quantcast