Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dietrich von Fürstenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1546Born
5 Jun 158538.6SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
7 Oct 158539.0ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
28 Jul 158942.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jul 158942.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 158942.8Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
4 Dec 161872.1DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Dietrich von Fürstenberg (VIAF: 42631820)
Bishop Dietrich von Fürstenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau, Waterlappe
Ordained BishopChateau, Chapel, Böddeken
Death PlaceChâteau, Neuhaus

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267
  • bd/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,966
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 11
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast