Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurentius Fabritius

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1535BornUerdingen
23 Mar 158853.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
23 Mar 158853.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
7 Aug 158853.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
22 Jul 160065.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Laurentius Fabritius:
Bishop Laurentius Fabritius (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015