Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1361¹AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
1 Sep 1361Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
3 Feb 1387DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Friedrich (VIAF: 107737143)
Bishop Friedrich (died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 184
  • ob/c2: ATh, 26 Nov 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,881

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast