Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso de Fonseca

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1469AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
25 Feb 1470Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
26 Aug 1485AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
24 May 1493AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
1505²DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Fonseca
Bishop Alfonso de Fonseca (died 1505) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 78, and Page 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 209
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,499
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1470, Number 2
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 309, Number 195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast