Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Vaccari

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Noli


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Dec 1485AppointedBishop of Noli, Italy
24 Jan 1502AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
1510¹ResignedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
20 Feb 1511DiedBishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Vaccari
Bishop Domenico Vaccari (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Noli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 200, and Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Apr 2016