Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Ferrante

Deceased

Bishop of Andria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1702Born
9 Apr 174643.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 175754.0AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
6 Jan 175754.0Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
6 Jun 177269.4DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ferrante
Bishop Francesco Ferrante (born , died ) Bishop of Andria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReggio Calabria

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1767
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 83
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast