Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Venier

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Sep 1470AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
2 Nov 1470Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
10 Aug 1490DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Venier:
Archbishop Giovanni Venier (died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,125
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015