Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph Erghum

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Oct 1375AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
9 Dec 1375Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
13 Jul 1388AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
4 Apr 1400DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ralph Erghum:
Bishop Ralph Erghum (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 130, and Page 435
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 600
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013