Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Umberto Locati, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1503Born
5 Apr 156865.3AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
25 Apr 156865.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
1581¹78.0ResignedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
17 Oct 158784.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Umberto Locati:
Bishop Umberto Locati O.P. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 13, Number 40
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013