Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Boetius Egan, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ross, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Mar 1647AppointedBishop of Ross, Ireland
5 Apr 1648Ordained BishopBishop of Ross, Ireland
21 May 1650DiedBishop of Ross, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Boetius Egan
Bishop Boetius Egan O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Ross

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWaterford

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 297
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 8
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast