Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Duval, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Baghdad

Vicar Apostolic of Ispahan

Note/Previous Titular See: (Bernardo di Santa Teresa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1597BornClamecy
16 Aug 163841.3AppointedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
22 Aug 163841.3Ordained BishopBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
25 Sep 163841.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ispahan, Iran
10 Apr 166971.9DiedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq

MicroData Summary for Jean Duval:
Bishop Jean Duval O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Baghdad

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 107, and Page 97
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 102, Number 614
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 12 Mar 2015