Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo Aymeri

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Mar 1324AppointedBishop of Orange, France
1 Apr 1324Ordained BishopBishop of Orange, France
6 Sep 1328AppointedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
5 Aug 1348³DiedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugo Aymeri
Bishop Hugo Aymeri (died ) Bishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 117, and Page 497
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,969

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast