Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Gattula

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1321AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
30 Aug 1321Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
8 Oct 1340DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gattula
Bishop Francesco Gattula (died ) Bishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,863
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 6 May 2019

Quantcast