Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Nicolas Deschamps de Chaumont

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1701³Born
13 Mar 172826.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 174139.6SelectedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
17 Apr 174139.8ConfirmedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
23 May 174139.9Ordained BishopBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
2 Nov 176362.3DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Nicolas Deschamps de Chaumont
Bishop Joseph-Nicolas Deschamps de Chaumont (born , died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambery

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 223
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast