Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gonzalo del Campo (López de Ocampo)

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Oct 1623AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
10 Mar 1624Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lima, Peru
20 Aug 1625InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
15 Oct 1627DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo del Campo (López de Ocampo)
Archbishop Gonzalo del Campo (López de Ocampo) (died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,393
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 145, Number 922
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 221
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,624, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast