Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal de Remolins

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Bishop of Fermo

Administrator of Gallipoli

Administrator of Palermo

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1462²Born
3 Mar 150139.1SelectedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
31 Mar 150139.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
31 May 150341.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 150341.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
4 Aug 150341.5AppointedAdministrator of Perugia, Italy
150442.0AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy
Mar 150644.1ResignedAdministrator of Perugia, Italy
27 Oct 151149.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
Dec 151149.9AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
23 Jan 151250.0AppointedAdministrator of Palermo, Italy
22 Jun 151351.4AppointedAdministrator of Sarno, Italy
9 Sep 151351.6AppointedAdministrator of Gallipoli, Italy
8 Aug 151553.6AppointedAdministrator of Lavello, Italy
10 Dec 151553.9ResignedAdministrator of Lavello, Italy
11 Feb 151755.1ResignedAdministrator of Sarno, Italy
16 Mar 151755.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
6 Jul 151755.5ResignedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
5 Feb 151856.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco de Remolins (VIAF: 32814195)
Francesco Cardinal de Remolins (born 1462, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLérida, Diocese of Lérida, Spain
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 31 May 1503
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 293, and Page 221
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,082
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 19, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 244
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1501, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 May 2018

Quantcast