Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso de Aragón

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1470²Born
14 Aug 14788.6AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
7 Nov 150131.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 150131.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
23 Jan 151242.0AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
4 Apr 151242.2InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
24 Feb 152050.1DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Aragón (VIAF: 3539630)
Archbishop Alfonso de Aragón (born 1470, died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCervera, Diocese of Lérida
Ordained BishopSanta Fé, Monastery, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Death PlaceLécera

  • a priest for 18.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 18, Number 13
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1501, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Apr 2018